Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 03/21/2021 at 23:01:55 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS JOHN A KELLY

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOHN A KELLY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********73AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

JOHN A KELLY

Bradenton, FL 34205-3823

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIZABETH MURANTE FERRELL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 3/4/2021 AS TO JOHN A KELLY

02/25/2021 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 3/4/2021 AS TO JOHN A KELLY

COMPLAINT

02/25/2021 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/25/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • Hearing04/05/2021 at 11:30AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$310.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 896450; Tender Amount: $310.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT 1 AFFIDAVIT OF ZACHARY DUNHAM / EXHIBIT II BILL OF SALE / EXHIBIT III ACCOUNT STATEMENT ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 3/4/2021 AS TO JOHN A KELLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL, ELIZABETH MURANTE