This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/06/2023 at 01:47:50 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS JEFFREY MORGAN

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JEFFREY MORGAN. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********58AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

JEFFREY MORGAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHAN ALEXI GREEN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/01/2023 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/01/2023 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM SUMMARY OF ACCOUNT OF ACTIVITY/BILL OF SALE AND ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNTS/ AFFIDAVIT OF CREDIT ONE BANK/CERTIFICATE OF CONFORMITY

02/01/2023 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM SUMMARY OF ACCOUNT OF ACTIVITY/BILL OF SALE AND ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNTS/ AFFIDAVIT OF CREDIT ONE BANK/CERTIFICATE OF CONFORMITY

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED TO JEFFREY MORGAN - ISSUED 2/2/2023

02/01/2023 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED TO JEFFREY MORGAN - ISSUED 2/2/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • Hearing03/20/2023 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $310.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1111644; Tender Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1111644

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 2/2/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 3/20/2023 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1505752

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED TO JEFFREY MORGAN - ISSUED 2/2/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM SUMMARY OF ACCOUNT OF ACTIVITY/BILL OF SALE AND ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNTS/ AFFIDAVIT OF CREDIT ONE BANK/CERTIFICATE OF CONFORMITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 2/2/2023 - id number 2482154

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 AssessmentID 12033085

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase 412023SC000658SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 2/1/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less