This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/14/2020 at 15:46:15 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS JAINA A VAN HORNE

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JAINA A VAN HORNE. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********50AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

610 Broadway Longboat

Key, FL 34228

Defendant

JAINA A VAN HORNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOLLY KATHLEEN FITZPATRICK

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT FILED IN OPEN COURT

03/09/2020 - DEFAULT FILED IN OPEN COURT

SUMMONS SERVED JAINA A VAN HORNE ON 02/03/2020

02/04/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED JAINA A VAN HORNE ON 02/03/2020

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JAINA A VAN HORNE 01/23/2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JAINA A VAN HORNE 01/23/2020

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • Hearing03/09/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF PRESENT, REPRESENTED BY ROBERT HOFFMAN, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT SERVED DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FILED IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED JAINA A VAN HORNE ON 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$185.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797256; Tender Amount: $185.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketACCOUNT SUMMARY/ AFFIDAVIT OF SALE/ CERTIFICATE OF CONFORMITY/- EXHIBIT A- ASSET SCHEDULE-ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JAINA A VAN HORNE 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less