This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/13/2020 at 15:46:02 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS ARMANDO UGARTE

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARMANDO UGARTE. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT A FARRANCE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********49AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT A FARRANCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

ARMANDO UGARTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLEEN E LEHMANN

 

Court Documents

SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ORDER

03/10/2020 - SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ORDER

SUMMONS SERVED ARMANDO UGARTE ON 01/27/2020

01/27/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED ARMANDO UGARTE ON 01/27/2020

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ARMANDO UGARTE 01/23/2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ARMANDO UGARTE 01/23/2020

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Hearing03/09/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF PRESENT, REPRESENTED BY ROBERT HOFFMAN, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT PRESENT, PRO SE SERVED ADMIT CLAIM SENT TO MEDIATION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ARMANDO UGARTE ON 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$185.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797253; Tender Amount: $185.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSUMMARY OF ACCOUNT ACTIVITY/ AFFIDAVIT OF SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR/ CERTIFICATE OF CONFORMITY/ BILL OF SALE/ FORWARD FLOW ACCOUNTS PURCHASE AGREEMENT ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ARMANDO UGARTE 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less