Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/31/2021 at 23:54:45 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********63AX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT

Defendant

ELIZABETH HERBERT

Bradenton, FL 34208-5006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHAN ALEXI GREEN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

04/29/2021 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

SUMMONS NON SERVED ELIZABETH HERBERT

04/06/2021 - SUMMONS NON SERVED ELIZABETH HERBERT

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO ELIZABETH HERBERT ON 3/8/21

03/01/2021 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO ELIZABETH HERBERT ON 3/8/21

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/01/2021 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/01/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Hearing04/12/2021 at 10:30AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF PRESENT - REPRESENTED BY DEREK DIPASQUALE, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT NO PROOF OF SERVICE CONTINUED FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED ELIZABETH HERBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$185.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 898355; Tender Amount: $185.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT A BILL OF SALE ATTACHED TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFIFTH THIRD BANK TRIO CREDIT CARD STATEMENT ATTACHED TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO ELIZABETH HERBERT ON 3/8/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CONFORMITY ATTACHED TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI