This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/26/2023 at 16:01:08 (UTC).

MICHELE KARLSBERG Et Al VS CAROLYN DOMBROSKI

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 MICHELE KARLSBERG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CAROLYN DOMBROSKI. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********73AX

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MICHELE KARLSBERG

VICTORIA WERNER

Defendant

CAROLYN DOMBROSKI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ROBERT J HOFFMAN

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

05/16/2023 - FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

RETURN OF SERVICE SUBPOENA SERVED TO TODD BOWMAN

04/28/2023 - RETURN OF SERVICE SUBPOENA SERVED TO TODD BOWMAN

RETURN OF SERVICE SUBPOENA SERVED SUSAN MILLER 4/25/2023

04/26/2023 - RETURN OF SERVICE SUBPOENA SERVED SUSAN MILLER 4/25/2023

DEFENDANTS WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

04/24/2023 - DEFENDANTS WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

COPY OF SUBPOENA ISSUED TO TODD BOWMAN 04/20/2023

04/20/2023 - COPY OF SUBPOENA ISSUED TO TODD BOWMAN 04/20/2023

SUBPOENA RETURNED NON-SERVED

04/13/2023 - SUBPOENA RETURNED NON-SERVED

PLAINTIFFS WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

05/01/2023 - PLAINTIFFS WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

SUBPOENA ISSUED TO JACK DEAN 04/04/2023

04/04/2023 - SUBPOENA ISSUED TO JACK DEAN 04/04/2023

NOTICE OF FILING USB DRIVE//DOCUMENTS - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

04/24/2023 - NOTICE OF FILING USB DRIVE//DOCUMENTS - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT/EVIDENCE CHANGE OF CUSTODY FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • Hearing05/03/2023 at 10:00AM - JACS-FINAL HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SUBPOENA SERVED TO TODD BOWMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SUBPOENA SERVED SUSAN MILLER 4/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING USB DRIVE//DOCUMENTS - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $318.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1098973; Tender Amount: $310.00; Receipt Number: 1134217; Tender Amount: $6.00; Receipt Number: 1139754; Tender Amount: $2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER FROM PLAINTIFFS - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF OA NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION SIGNED BY CAROLYN DOMBROSKI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $318.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1098973; Tender Amount: $310.00; Receipt Number: 1134217; Tender Amount: $6.00; Receipt Number: 1139754; Tender Amount: $2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO CAROLYN DOMBROSKI 12/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1098973

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 12/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 1/30/2023 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1493407

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 12/21/2022 - id number 2466971

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 AssessmentID 12011342

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase 412022SC007173SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 12/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less