This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/08/2020 at 09:02:54 (UTC).

MICHAEL WILLIAM GREY VS ELIZABETH ANN GREY

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 MICHAEL WILLIAM GREY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ELIZABETH ANN GREY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********20AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MICHAEL WILLIAM GREY

Palmetto, FL 34221

Respondent

ELIZABETH ANN GREY

Palmetto, FL 34221

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • Hearing03/02/2020 at 01:30PM - JACS-FINAL HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 3-E; Judge: MORELAND, DIANA L;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$408.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 810769; Tender Amount: $10.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) (UNCONTESTED)-RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL HEARING MARCH 2, 2020 AT 1:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER FOR MANATEE, SARASOTA AND DESOTO COUNTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMEENT AGREEMENT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)- MICHAEL GREY, ELIZABETH GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketFANTELY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM)- MICHAEL GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM)- ELIZABETH GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketANSWER, WAIVER, AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE- ELIZABETH GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE- ELIZABETH GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- MICHAEL GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- ELIZABETH GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED - ELIZABETH GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED- MICHAEL GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$408.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797037; Tender Amount: $397.50;

    Read MoreRead Less