Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/13/2020 at 13:39:55 (UTC).

MICHAEL R PIETSCH VS DAN THOMECZEK

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 MICHAEL R PIETSCH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAN THOMECZEK. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT A FARRANCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********00AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT A FARRANCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL R PIETSCH

Defendants

DAN THOMECZEK

ANN THOMECZEK

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMARY DISPOSITION

07/08/2020 - ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMARY DISPOSITION

COPY OF EMAILS/LEDGER/PROPOSAL/BANK CHECK PRIOR TO 2ND DEPOSIT

06/15/2020 - COPY OF EMAILS/LEDGER/PROPOSAL/BANK CHECK PRIOR TO 2ND DEPOSIT

COUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM'S REPORT TO THE COURT

06/26/2020 - COUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM'S REPORT TO THE COURT

LETTER TO COURT OUTLING OUR POSITION - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

06/15/2020 - LETTER TO COURT OUTLING OUR POSITION - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO COUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM

06/15/2020 - ORDER OF REFERRAL TO COUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM

COPY OF PROPOSAL/SIGNED CONTRACT FOR WORK ON ROOF; STATEMENT FOR WORK DONE; COPIES OF EMAILS

06/15/2020 - COPY OF PROPOSAL/SIGNED CONTRACT FOR WORK ON ROOF; STATEMENT FOR WORK DONE; COPIES OF EMAILS

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE- MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

05/26/2020 - NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE- MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

SUMMONS SERVED ANN THOMECZEK ON 03/18/2020

03/20/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED ANN THOMECZEK ON 03/18/2020

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AS TO DAN THOMECZEK

03/16/2020 - NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AS TO DAN THOMECZEK

AMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/16/2020 - AMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM

ORDER RESCHEDULING PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE TO MON-DAY, APRIL 13, 2020 AT 9:00 A.M.

03/03/2020 - ORDER RESCHEDULING PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE TO MON-DAY, APRIL 13, 2020 AT 9:00 A.M.

REQUEST TO RESCHEDULE COURT DATE - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

02/28/2020 - REQUEST TO RESCHEDULE COURT DATE - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

SUMMONS SERVED DAN THOMECZEK 2/24/2020

02/25/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED DAN THOMECZEK 2/24/2020

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/11/2020 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • Hearing08/25/2020 at 01:30PM - JACS-UNLISTED MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMARY DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM'S REPORT TO THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF EMAILS/LEDGER/PROPOSAL/BANK CHECK PRIOR TO 2ND DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO COURT OUTLING OUR POSITION - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO COUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF PROPOSAL/SIGNED CONTRACT FOR WORK ON ROOF; STATEMENT FOR WORK DONE; COPIES OF EMAILS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • Hearing06/11/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF PRESENT - PRO SE DEFENDANT PRESENT - PRO SE DEFENDANT SERVED DENIED CLAIM MEDIATION SET FOR 6/25/2020 @ 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE- MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ANN THOMECZEK - HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RESCHEDULING PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE TO MON-DAY, APRIL 13, 2020 AT 9:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketPLEADING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO RESCHEDULE COURT DATE - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED DAN THOMECZEK 2/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$320.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 803969; Tender Amount: $310.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO DAN THOMECZAK 2/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less