This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 01/31/2023 at 05:15:17 (UTC).

MICHAEL ALBANESE, RAPLH ALBANESE Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 MICHAEL ALBANESE, RAPLH ALBANESE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********19AX

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Decedent

RAPLH ALBANESE

Bradenton, FL 34208

Not Yet Classified

MICHAEL ALBANESE

Longwood, FL 32750

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

JUSTIN M BRICK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCHECKLIST : PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND CLOSING ESTATE - REVIEWED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketLETTER DATED 12/22/2022 FROM BOGIN, MUNNS AND MUNNS REGARDING FILING OF PROPOSED ORDER OF DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER OF DISCHARGE - FORWARDED TO PROBATE COORDINATOR ON 1/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketCHECKLIST: PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND CLOSING ESTATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISCHARGE (FULL WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketSATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM - MICHAEL ALBANESE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS (INDIVIDUAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE (FULL WAIVER) - LISAANN BOINAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE (FULL WAIVER) - MICHAEL ALBANESE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION: MICHAEL ALBANESE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE: MICHAEL ALBANESE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT: MICHAEL ALBANESE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH: RALPH ALBANESE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DEATH CERTIFICATE OF RALPH ALBANESE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11901540

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CP001619CPAXMA Filed with Clerk on 5/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRICK JUSTIN M