This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 03/11/2023 at 13:34:48 (UTC).

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY VS COUNTRY PALMS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIOIN INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against COUNTRY PALMS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIOIN INC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********48AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

SANDOR FARKAS

COUNTRY PALMS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIOIN INC

GARY W CURRIN INC

RENATA GULYAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COREY MICHAEL LEWIS

Defendant Attorney

KARI LYNNE MARTIN

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - RENATA G FARKAS

02/24/2023 - MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - RENATA G FARKAS

NOTICE OF SERVING COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

02/22/2023 - NOTICE OF SERVING COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

SUMMONS SERVED SANDOR FARKAS 2/21/2023

02/22/2023 - SUMMONS SERVED SANDOR FARKAS 2/21/2023

SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY 2/4/2023

02/22/2023 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY 2/4/2023

SUMMONS SERVED COUNTRY PALMS HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC. 1/24/2023

02/22/2023 - SUMMONS SERVED COUNTRY PALMS HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC. 1/24/2023

SUMMONS SERVED GARY W. CURRY, INC., D/B/A ROOFING BY CURRY 1/25/2023

02/22/2023 - SUMMONS SERVED GARY W. CURRY, INC., D/B/A ROOFING BY CURRY 1/25/2023

SUMMONS SERVED RENATA GULYAS 2/4/2023

02/22/2023 - SUMMONS SERVED RENATA GULYAS 2/4/2023

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE -MAY 8 2023 AT 9:00 AM

02/21/2023 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE -MAY 8 2023 AT 9:00 AM

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT GARY W. CURRY, INC D/B/A ROOFING BY CURRY - NOT RECORDED FEE NOT PAID

02/14/2023 - NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT GARY W. CURRY, INC D/B/A ROOFING BY CURRY - NOT RECORDED FEE NOT PAID

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT COUNTRY PALMS HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.

01/31/2023 - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT COUNTRY PALMS HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT COUNTRY PALMS HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.

01/31/2023 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT COUNTRY PALMS HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND VIA INTERLINEATION

01/27/2023 - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND VIA INTERLINEATION

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY STATUS

01/26/2023 - AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY STATUS

MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT VIA INTERLINEATION

01/26/2023 - MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT VIA INTERLINEATION

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

01/12/2023 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

01/10/2023 - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

CERTIFICATION AS TO POSSESSION OF THE ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

01/10/2023 - CERTIFICATION AS TO POSSESSION OF THE ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

NOTICE OF FILING

01/10/2023 - NOTICE OF FILING

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • Hearing05/08/2023 at 09:00AM - JACS-OTHER MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SNIFFEN, CHARLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • Hearing03/29/2023 at 01:30PM - JACS-OTHER MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SNIFFEN, CHARLES; Result: CANCELLED-JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - RENATA G FARKAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED SANDOR FARKAS 2/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY 2/4/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED COUNTRY PALMS HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC. 1/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED GARY W. CURRY, INC., D/B/A ROOFING BY CURRY 1/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED RENATA GULYAS 2/4/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE -MAY 8 2023 AT 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION AS TO POSSESSION OF THE ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT SANDOR FARKAS/ COUNTRY PALMS TIOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC./ GARY W. CURRY, INC., D/B/A ROOFING BY CURRY/ RENATA GULYAS/ UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF TIE SUBJECT PROPERTY -- ISSUED 1/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM/CROSSCLAIM/COUNTERCLAIM/COURTERPETITION/TIIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - COPY OF THE NOTE AND THE ORGINAL NOTE CERTIFICATIION/ EXHIBIT B - COPY OF THE MORTGAGE / EXHIBIT C- COPY OF THE AASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE / EXHIBIT D - LOAN MODIFICATION AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 1/11/2023 - id number 2473981

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $905.00 AssessmentID 12021405

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCase 412023CA000148CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 1/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less