This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 09/08/2020 at 15:46:57 (UTC).

MELANIE LANCASTER Et Al VS CRAIG HAVRILLA Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 MELANIE LANCASTER filed an Other lawsuit against CRAIG HAVRILLA. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********17AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SCOTT LANCASTER

MELANIE LANCASTER

Defendants

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

CRAIG HAVRILLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN THOMAS GOLDING

Defendant Attorneys

MILLER EXANTUS

LISA MARIE ORGA

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION PURSUANT TO RULE 1.360

08/20/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION PURSUANT TO RULE 1.360

NOTICE OF MEDIATION VIA ZOOM JANUARY 19, 2021 01:30 P.M.,

08/06/2020 - NOTICE OF MEDIATION VIA ZOOM JANUARY 19, 2021 01:30 P.M.,

PLAINTIFF'S WAIVER OF OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES

07/21/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S WAIVER OF OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFFSREQUEST FOR COPIES

07/17/2020 - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFFSREQUEST FOR COPIES

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DEFENDANT, CRAIG HAVRILLA'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

07/17/2020 - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DEFENDANT, CRAIG HAVRILLA'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

PLAINTIFF'S WAIVER OF OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES

07/07/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S WAIVER OF OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES

CROSS -NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION MELANIE LANCASTER JULY 8, 2020 AT 1:00 PM / SCOTT LANSCATER JULY 8, 2020 AT 3:00 PM

06/09/2020 - CROSS -NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION MELANIE LANCASTER JULY 8, 2020 AT 1:00 PM / SCOTT LANSCATER JULY 8, 2020 AT 3:00 PM

PLAINTIFF, MELANIE LANCASTER, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S, CRAIG HAVRILLA, INTERROGATORIES

05/05/2020 - PLAINTIFF, MELANIE LANCASTER, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S, CRAIG HAVRILLA, INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF, MELANIE LANCASTER, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, INTERROGATORIES

05/05/2020 - PLAINTIFF, MELANIE LANCASTER, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

03/25/2020 - REQUEST FOR COPIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

03/25/2020 - REQUEST FOR COPIES

PLAINTIFF'S WAIVER OF OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES

03/25/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S WAIVER OF OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, MELANIE COOPER LANCASTER

03/23/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, MELANIE COOPER LANCASTER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES - LISA M ORGA OBO CRAIG HAVRILLA

03/23/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES - LISA M ORGA OBO CRAIG HAVRILLA

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED / CRAIG HAVRILLA - 03/02/2020

03/06/2020 - SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED / CRAIG HAVRILLA - 03/02/2020

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY PARTIAL DISMISSAL AS TO COUNT I BODILY INJURY CLAIM AND COUNT V-1 LOSS OF CONSORTIUM CLAIM

02/26/2020 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY PARTIAL DISMISSAL AS TO COUNT I BODILY INJURY CLAIM AND COUNT V-1 LOSS OF CONSORTIUM CLAIM

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: CRAIG HAVRILLA / SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY - NAME DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT -- 1/23/2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: CRAIG HAVRILLA / SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY - NAME DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT -- 1/23/2020

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGTORIES TO DEFENDANT CRAIG HAVRILLA

01/22/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGTORIES TO DEFENDANT CRAIG HAVRILLA

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketSUBPOENA DUCESTECUM RETURNED SERVED DR. JULIO CANTERO JULY, 31 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketSUBPOENA DUCES TECUM( RETURNED SERVED DR. MERCHER INTERCOASTAL MEDICAL GROUP JULY, 31 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMETN TO RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION - EXHIBIT B - PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMETN TO RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION - EXHIBIT A- AMENDED NOTICE OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION (AS TO LOCATION OF CME)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION PURSUANT TO RULE 1.360

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VIDEOGRAPHER AT CME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION / EXHIBITS B - PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION / EXHIBIT A- AMENDED NOTICE OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION (AS TO LOCATION OF CME)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION PURSUANT TO RULE 1.360

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VIDEOGRAPHER AT CME

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY - SUMMONS (SERVED) FEBRUARY 26, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY PARTIAL DISMISSAL AS TO COUNT I BODILY INJURY CLAIM AND COUNT V-1 LOSS OF CONSORTIUM CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY - FEBRUARY 10 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$420.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797017; Tender Amount: $420.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: CRAIG HAVRILLA / SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY - NAME DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT -- 1/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT CRAIG HAVRILLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES AND REQUEST FOR DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGTORIES TO DEFENDANT CRAIG HAVRILLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less