This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 03/24/2023 at 18:03:51 (UTC).

MATTHEW M BEDRAN VS BRITTANY A STONE

Case Summary

On 08/23/2022 MATTHEW M BEDRAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BRITTANY A STONE. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN BRUNING. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********83AX

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEVIN BRUNING

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MATTHEW M BEDRAN

Ranch, FL 34202

Respondent

BRITTANY A STONE

Ranch, FL 34202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ANGELA DAVIS TOBAYGO

Respondent Attorney

ROBERT J HOFFMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING RESPONDENT'S FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT(LONG FORM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PETITIONERS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (LONG FORM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO HUSBAND'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketHUSBAND'S RESPONSE TO WIFE'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT FOR PETITIONER'S VIOLATION OF THE STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT FOR PETITIONER'S VIOLATION OF THE STANDING FAMIILY LAW COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketANSWER TO WIFE'S COUNTER PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILDREN AND COUNT FOR PARTITION OF MARITAL PROPERTY AND OTHER RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketBASIC PARENTING PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED BASIC PARENTING PLAN- FILED BY ROBERT J. HOFFMAN , ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO UPDATE THE CASE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketHUSBANDS NOTICE OF FILING STANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER FOR MANATEE, SARASOTA, AND DESOTO COUNTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketHUSBANDS NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketHUSBANDS NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketHUSBANDS NOTICE OF FILING DRIVERS LICENSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketHUSBANDS VERIFIED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILDREN AND OTHER RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 8/24/2022 - id number 2423788

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $397.50 AssessmentID 11953043

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketCase 412022DR003583DRAXMA Filed with Clerk on 8/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less