Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/10/2020 at 15:06:00 (UTC).

MARJORIE CADET VS AMOS FRANCOIS

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 MARJORIE CADET filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AMOS FRANCOIS. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********60AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARJORIE CADET

Respondent

AMOS FRANCOIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RICHARD WEISSFELD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE AS TO AMOS FRANCOIS SUMMONS SERVED 02/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$407.50; Total Voided Amount:($10.00); Receipt Number: 800657; Tender Amount: $10.00; Voided Amount: ($10.00); Voided: Voided;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$407.50; Total Voided Amount:($10.00); Receipt Number: 800416; Tender Amount: $10.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED AS TO AMOS FRANCOIS - 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION REVIEWED - NO ADDITIONAL ACTION REQUIRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$407.50; Total Voided Amount:($10.00); Receipt Number: 797455; Tender Amount: $397.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING STANDARD ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) - MARJORIE CADET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK TO BE ISSUED AS TO AMOS FRANCOIS - FEE NOT PAID

    Read MoreRead Less