This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/11/2023 at 14:08:43 (UTC).

MARIA PEREDA-MORENO VS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 MARIA PEREDA-MORENO filed an Other lawsuit against FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********53AX

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIA PEREDA-MORENO

Defendant

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROB KEVIN ROY

Defendant Attorney

DAVID A MERCER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING JUNE 29, 2023 AT 9:15 A.M.,

05/05/2023 - NOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING JUNE 29, 2023 AT 9:15 A.M.,

SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF 1.310(B)(6) DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM (AS TO THE ADDITION OF ITEM 8 ON EXHIBIT A ONLY) KERR NEWTON JULY 24, 2023 AT 1:30 P.M. | VIA ZOOM

05/05/2023 - SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF 1.310(B)(6) DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM (AS TO THE ADDITION OF ITEM 8 ON EXHIBIT A ONLY) KERR NEWTON JULY 24, 2023 AT 1:30 P.M. | VIA ZOOM

AMENDED NOTICE OF 1.310(B)(6) DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM (AS TO THE ADDITION OF ITEMS 6 AND 7 ON EXHIBIT A ONLY) KERR NEWTON JULY 24, 2023 AT 1:30 P.M. | VIA ZOOM

05/05/2023 - AMENDED NOTICE OF 1.310(B)(6) DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM (AS TO THE ADDITION OF ITEMS 6 AND 7 ON EXHIBIT A ONLY) KERR NEWTON JULY 24, 2023 AT 1:30 P.M. | VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF 1.310(B)(6) DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM KERR NEWTON JULY 24, 2023 AT 1:30 P.M. VIA ZOOM

05/05/2023 - NOTICE OF 1.310(B)(6) DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM KERR NEWTON JULY 24, 2023 AT 1:30 P.M. VIA ZOOM

CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY

04/21/2023 - CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY

NOTICE OF MEDIATION SEPTEMBER 14 2023 9AM VIA ZOOM

04/21/2023 - NOTICE OF MEDIATION SEPTEMBER 14 2023 9AM VIA ZOOM

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MARIA PEREDA-MORENO

04/06/2023 - AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MARIA PEREDA-MORENO

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY WITH ATTACHED LETTER TO DAVID MERCER / NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S WRITTEN INTERROGATORIES

04/05/2023 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY WITH ATTACHED LETTER TO DAVID MERCER / NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S WRITTEN INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/05/2023 - PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2023
  • Hearing06/29/2023 at 09:15AM - JACS-COMPEL; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: NICHOLAS, EDWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING JUNE 29, 2023 AT 9:15 A.M.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF 1.310(B)(6) DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM (AS TO THE ADDITION OF ITEM 8 ON EXHIBIT A ONLY) KERR NEWTON JULY 24, 2023 AT 1:30 P.M. | VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF 1.310(B)(6) DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM (AS TO THE ADDITION OF ITEMS 6 AND 7 ON EXHIBIT A ONLY) KERR NEWTON JULY 24, 2023 AT 1:30 P.M. | VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF 1.310(B)(6) DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM KERR NEWTON JULY 24, 2023 AT 1:30 P.M. VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION SEPTEMBER 14 2023 9AM VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MARIA PEREDA-MORENO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY WITH ATTACHED LETTER TO DAVID MERCER / NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S WRITTEN INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S WRITTEN INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC -- ISSUED 7/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1055897

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 7/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 7/28/2022 - id number 2411800

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11936922

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CA003053CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 7/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less