Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 04/10/2021 at 13:10:31 (UTC).

MARIA ANDERSON VS ROBERT A KAEKEL

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 MARIA ANDERSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROBERT A KAEKEL. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TERI K DEES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********94AX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TERI K DEES

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARIA ANDERSON

Respondent

ROBERT A KAEKEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

JEANNE MARIE BENNETT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNEEDS LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM)- WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL JEANNE M. BENNETT, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF ROBERT A. KAEKEL,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE-WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNEEDS LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ROBERT KAEKEL 3/3/21

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketTWELFTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT FAMILY DIVISION RULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE- WIFE (SECOND PAGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketTWELFTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT FAMILY DIVISION RULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCONFIDENTIAL DISCLOSURE OF REDACTED PERSONAL IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS: PERSONAL SERVICE ON AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEANNE MARIE BENNETT