This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/31/2020 at 15:16:17 (UTC).

MARGARET ANNE THOMAS, TERRANCE LEE THOMAS Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 MARGARET ANNE THOMAS, TERRANCE LEE THOMAS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********22AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE

 

Party Details

Petitioners

TERRANCE LEE THOMAS

Bradenton, FL 34207

MARGARET ANNE THOMAS

Bradenton, FL 34207

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$408.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 835139; Tender Amount: $10.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE-RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING JUNE 29, 2020 9:00 A.M. VIA ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketSECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - 6/29/2020 AT 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Hearing03/30/2020 at 08:30AM - JACS-FINAL HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 3-D; Judge: WHYTE, STEPHEN MATHEW; Result: CANCELLED-JACS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION MARCH 30, 2020 AT 8:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketFINAL HEARING LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER MARCH 30, 2020 AT 8:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketPRO SE MOTION TO MOVE DATE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketFINAL HEARING LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER MARCH 24, 2020 AT 1:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNEEDS LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER FOR MANATEE SARASOTA AND DESOTO COUNTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$408.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797088; Tender Amount: $397.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF FINANCIAL AFFIDAVITS AND MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less