This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/11/2022 at 17:24:36 (UTC).

M E S VS CAPE CORAL HOSPITAL Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 M E S filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against CAPE CORAL HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********23AX

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M E S

Defendants

PREMIER BEHAVIORAL SOLUTIONS OF FLORIDA

CAPE CORAL HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL GORDON FINK

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW

06/24/2021 - PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW

ORDER SETTING HEARING AND ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

06/25/2021 - ORDER SETTING HEARING AND ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/28/2021 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

06/30/2021

Hearing06/30/2021 at 01:30PM - BAKER ACT HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: SUNCOAST BEHAVORIAL HEALTH; Judge: MCEWEN, MARY; Result: DISMISSED;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2021

DocketUpdated Event BHRG on 6/30/2021 0130 PM Judge MARY MCEWEN results DISMISSED on 6/28/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2021

DocketEvent BHRG scheduled on 6/30/2021 at 0130 PM, JC - Judge MARY MCEWEN presiding. EventID 1331777

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2021
View Court Documents

DocketORDER SETTING HEARING AND ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2021

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MARK SARVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2021

DocketCase 412021CA002623CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 6/24/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less