This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/16/2021 at 18:06:23 (UTC).

LYNN M BOUCHER, RICHARD M KUMOR SR Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 LYNN M BOUCHER, RICHARD M KUMOR SR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********06AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LYNN M BOUCHER

Hadley, MA 01075

Decedent

RICHARD M KUMOR SR

Palmetto, FL 34221

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MITCHELL IRA KITROSER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF RICHARD M. KUMOR, SR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH - RICHARD MARTIN TUMOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM KITROSER ASSOCIATES - WILL FOR DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$400.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 886520; Tender Amount: $400.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND - RICHARD M. KUMOR JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketE-FILED COPY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF RICHARD M. KUMOR, SR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE. AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND - JENNIFER WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND - MICHAEL ROULEAU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND - ARMAND E. BOUCHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND - DUKE KUMOR AS NATURAL GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND - JAMIE PUCKETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND - LYNN M. BOUCHER, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND - DIANE S. ROULEAU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND - LYNN M. BOUCHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND - JACK KUMOR AS NATURAL GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KITROSER , MITCHELL IRA