Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 03/21/2021 at 23:16:00 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS KELLY JAWORSKI

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KELLY JAWORSKI. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********16AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

KELLY JAWORSKI

Ellenton, FL 34222-3434

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREA MARIE ROEBUCK

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT A CREDIT ONE BANK CREDIT CARD STATEMENT/ EXHIBIT B BILL OF SALE AND ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNTS AS ATTACHED TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/23/2021 - EXHIBIT A CREDIT ONE BANK CREDIT CARD STATEMENT/ EXHIBIT B BILL OF SALE AND ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNTS AS ATTACHED TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS SERVED KELLY JAWORSKI 03/02/2021

03/03/2021 - SUMMONS SERVED KELLY JAWORSKI 03/02/2021

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO KELLY JAWORSKI 2/26/2021

02/23/2021 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO KELLY JAWORSKI 2/26/2021

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/23/2021 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/23/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • Hearing04/05/2021 at 10:30AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED KELLY JAWORSKI 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$185.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 895902; Tender Amount: $185.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT A CREDIT ONE BANK CREDIT CARD STATEMENT/ EXHIBIT B BILL OF SALE AND ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNTS AS ATTACHED TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO KELLY JAWORSKI 2/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROEBUCK , ANDREA M