This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/01/2020 at 10:01:54 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS ANGELINE VAN WAGNER

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANGELINE VAN WAGNER. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********57AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ANGELINE VAN WAGNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHELLE KIM HINES

Defendant Attorney

DAVID WADE EDWARDS

 

Court Documents

ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

03/31/2020 - ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

03/26/2020 - JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

JOINT STIPULATED MOTION TO WAIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

03/10/2020 - JOINT STIPULATED MOTION TO WAIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

JOINT STIPULATED MOTION TO WAIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

03/06/2020 - JOINT STIPULATED MOTION TO WAIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

ORDER WAIVING PRETRIAL

03/06/2020 - ORDER WAIVING PRETRIAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY DAVID W. EDWARDS OBO ANGELINE VAN WAGNER

02/24/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY DAVID W. EDWARDS OBO ANGELINE VAN WAGNER

SUMMONS SERVED ANGELINE VAN WAGNER ON 02/05/2020

02/06/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED ANGELINE VAN WAGNER ON 02/05/2020

ALIAS ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ANGELINE VANWAGNER

01/30/2020 - ALIAS ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ANGELINE VANWAGNER

SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED ANGELINE VANWAGNER

01/28/2020 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED ANGELINE VANWAGNER

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ANGELINE VANWAGNER 01/23/2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ANGELINE VANWAGNER 01/23/2020

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/22/2020 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ADOPTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATED MOTION TO WAIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Hearing03/09/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF PRESENT REPRESENTED RENEE WYATT, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT SERVED CONTINUE PENDING SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATED MOTION TO WAIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WAIVING PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY DAVID W. EDWARDS OBO ANGELINE VAN WAGNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ANGELINE VAN WAGNER ON 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$320.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 800060; Tender Amount: $10.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ANGELINE VANWAGNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED ANGELINE VANWAGNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$320.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797364; Tender Amount: $310.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT/ BILL OF SALE/ EXHIBIT A- BILL OF SALE AND ASSIGNMENT OF RECEIVABLES/ EXHIBIT A- BILL OF SALE AND ASSIGNMENT OF RECEIVABLES FROM MHC RECEIVABLES,/ EXHIBIT A-/ TRANSFER AND ASSIGNMENT-ATTACHED TO STAEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ANGELINE VANWAGNER 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant