This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 12/02/2022 at 03:12:41 (UTC).

LORRAINE JACKMAN Et Al VS AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2022 LORRAINE JACKMAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********50AX

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NATURAL HEALING ARTS MEDICAL CENTER INC

LORRAINE JACKMAN

Defendant

AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABRAHAM OVADIA

Defendant Attorney

PHILLIP THOMAS JONES

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/23/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/23/2022 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/ MEDIATION ISSUED TO AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY - 9/26/2022

09/23/2022 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/ MEDIATION ISSUED TO AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY - 9/26/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OBO DEFENDANT

10/19/2022 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OBO DEFENDANT

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

10/20/2022 - VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • Hearing10/24/2022 at 01:00PM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CANCELLED;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 10/24/2022 0100 PM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results CANCELLED on 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY AND AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OBO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$65.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 1074889; Tender Amount: $65.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/ MEDIATION ISSUED TO AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY - 9/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT- CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE DEPOSITION REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1074889

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 9/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 10/24/2022 at 0100 PM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1468909

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 9/24/2022 - id number 2436887

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $55.00 AssessmentID 11969452

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketCase 412022SC005650SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATURAL HEALING ARTS MEDICAL CENTRE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Auto-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OVADIA, ABRAHAM