This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/14/2020 at 08:40:30 (UTC).

LEAH FERRARO VS ISREAL MENA

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 LEAH FERRARO filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ISREAL MENA. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********21AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEAH FERRARO

Bradenton, FL 34205

Respondent

ISREAL MENA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • Hearing02/05/2020 at 09:30AM - INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 3-E; Judge: MORELAND, DIANA L; Result: DISMISSED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (SENT TO SAO PER JUDGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketINJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION CHECKLIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION SERVED - 1/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILD(REN) (SENT TO MSO FOR SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketRULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPETITIONER'S WAIVER OR NON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketLAW ENFORCEMENT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less