This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/22/2020 at 16:23:19 (UTC).

LAWRENCE KLEPETKO VS MOORINGS AT EDGEWATER CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 LAWRENCE KLEPETKO filed an Other lawsuit against MOORINGS AT EDGEWATER CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT A FARRANCE and MARK D SINGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********68AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT A FARRANCE

MARK D SINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAWRENCE KLEPETKO

Defendant

MOORINGS AT EDGEWATER CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MARY RUTH HAWK

 

Court Documents

ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT /ORDER AND ADDITIONAL OR ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR REHEARING

07/06/2020 - ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT /ORDER AND ADDITIONAL OR ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR REHEARING

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S "MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT AND ADDITIONAL OR ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR REHEARING"

07/01/2020 - DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S "MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT AND ADDITIONAL OR ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR REHEARING"

MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT/ORDER AND ADDITIONAL OR ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR REHEARING

06/29/2020 - MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT/ORDER AND ADDITIONAL OR ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR REHEARING

PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

06/25/2020 - PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

06/25/2020 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

PETITIONER'S MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

06/25/2020 - PETITIONER'S MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

06/12/2020 - ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

ORDER ON HEARING SET FOR JUNE 03, 2020 AT 200 P.M. VIA ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE

05/20/2020 - ORDER ON HEARING SET FOR JUNE 03, 2020 AT 200 P.M. VIA ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF HEARING WEDNESDAY, JUNE 3, 2020 AT 2:00 P.M.

03/31/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING WEDNESDAY, JUNE 3, 2020 AT 2:00 P.M.

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

03/26/2020 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (INCLUDING DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY)

01/22/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (INCLUDING DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT /ORDER AND ADDITIONAL OR ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR REHEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S "MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT AND ADDITIONAL OR ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR REHEARING"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT/ORDER AND ADDITIONAL OR ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR REHEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT/COPY OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/ OVEROF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE/ AFFIDAVIT OF MARY R. HAWK, ESQ., AS TO SUPPLEMENTAL SERVICES RENDERED/ TRANSACTION DETAIL/ AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE SUPPLEMENTAL ATTORNEY FEES ATTACHED TO MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITIONER'S MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketTRANSACTION DETAIL ATTACHED TO MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF FILING #2 PETITIONERS MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • Hearing06/03/2020 at 02:00PM - JACS-DISMISS; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • Hearing06/03/2020 at 02:00PM - JACS-DISMISS; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A; Result: CANCELLED-JACS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • Hearing06/03/2020 at 02:00PM - JACS-DISMISS; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-C; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A; Result: CANCELLED-JACS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCORRECTED VERSION TO THE HEARING JUNE 03, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON HEARING SET FOR JUNE 03, 2020 AT 200 P.M. VIA ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING WEDNESDAY, JUNE 3, 2020 AT 2:00 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$400.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797625; Tender Amount: $400.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (INCLUDING DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less