This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 09/10/2023 at 05:07:04 (UTC).

LARRY GREENSPON Et Al VS B W SBA INC

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 LARRY GREENSPON filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against B W SBA INC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********23AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LARRY GREENSPON

MARY GRATEHOUSE

Defendant

B W SBA INC

Not Yet Classified

BT MCCARTHY INC

GETTLE POOLS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORGAN RAY BENTLEY

Defendant Attorney

JEFFREY MICHAEL PASKERT

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

JOHN WILLIAM CHAPMAN JR

DAVID STEPHAN MAGLICH

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

08/14/2023 - MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, GETTLE POOLS, INC.'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES FROM DEFENDANT/THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF, B.W. SABA, INC.

05/11/2023 - THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, GETTLE POOLS, INC.'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES FROM DEFENDANT/THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF, B.W. SABA, INC.

THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, GETTLE POOLS, INC.'S, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO SECOND AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

04/17/2023 - THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, GETTLE POOLS, INC.'S, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO SECOND AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

ORDER ADOPTING AND APPROVING MAGISTRATES REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION

04/13/2023 - ORDER ADOPTING AND APPROVING MAGISTRATES REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION

MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, GETTLE POOLS, INC.'S, MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I-VI OF THE SECOND AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

03/29/2023 - MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, GETTLE POOLS, INC.'S, MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I-VI OF THE SECOND AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVING THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, BT MCCARTHY, INC.'S ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF B.W. SABA, INC. D/B/A SABA HOMES' INTERROGATORIES

03/27/2023 - NOTICE OF SERVING THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, BT MCCARTHY, INC.'S ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF B.W. SABA, INC. D/B/A SABA HOMES' INTERROGATORIES

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THIRD PARTY INTERROGATORIES LARRY GREENSPON,

03/24/2023 - MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THIRD PARTY INTERROGATORIES LARRY GREENSPON,

B.W. SABA, INC. D/B/A SABA HOMES' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO GETTLE POOLS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I-VLOF THE AMENDED THIRD- PARTY COMPLAINT

03/15/2023 - B.W. SABA, INC. D/B/A SABA HOMES' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO GETTLE POOLS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I-VLOF THE AMENDED THIRD- PARTY COMPLAINT

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - PLAINTIFFS ASSERT CLAIMS AGAISNT SABA RELATED TO PROJECT/ EXHIBIT B - GETTLE SERVED AS A GETTEL SUBCONTRACTOR FOR CONTRACT

03/06/2023 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - PLAINTIFFS ASSERT CLAIMS AGAISNT SABA RELATED TO PROJECT/ EXHIBIT B - GETTLE SERVED AS A GETTEL SUBCONTRACTOR FOR CONTRACT

NOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING MONDAY, AUGUST 28, 2023 AT 10:00 A.M. CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS CONFERENCE

08/25/2023 - NOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING MONDAY, AUGUST 28, 2023 AT 10:00 A.M. CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS CONFERENCE

PLAINTIFF'S, LARRY GREENSPON, RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S, B.W. SABA, INC. D/B/A SABA HOMES EXPERT PRODUCTION.

08/24/2023 - PLAINTIFF'S, LARRY GREENSPON, RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S, B.W. SABA, INC. D/B/A SABA HOMES EXPERT PRODUCTION.

PLAINTIFF'S, LARRY GREENSPON, NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO EXPERT INTERROGATORIES

08/24/2023 - PLAINTIFF'S, LARRY GREENSPON, NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO EXPERT INTERROGATORIES

B.W. SABA, INC. D/B/A SABA HOMES NOTICE OF SERVING EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

07/14/2023 - B.W. SABA, INC. D/B/A SABA HOMES NOTICE OF SERVING EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

NOT AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

05/10/2023 - NOT AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES

04/10/2023 - CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

04/10/2023 - PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

B.W. SABA, INC., D/B/A SABA HOMES' NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

04/07/2023 - B.W. SABA, INC., D/B/A SABA HOMES' NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

B.W. SABA, INC., D/B/A SABA HOMES' NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

03/30/2023 - B.W. SABA, INC., D/B/A SABA HOMES' NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2023
  • Hearing08/28/2023 at 10:00AM - JACS-OTHER MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SNIFFEN, CHARLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING MONDAY, AUGUST 28, 2023 AT 10:00 A.M. CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S, LARRY GREENSPON, RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S, B.W. SABA, INC. D/B/A SABA HOMES EXPERT PRODUCTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S, LARRY GREENSPON, NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO EXPERT INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketB.W. SABA, INC. D/B/A SABA HOMES NOTICE OF SERVING EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, GETTLE POOLS, INC.'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES FROM DEFENDANT/THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF, B.W. SABA, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOT AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, GETTLE POOLS, INC.'S, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO SECOND AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ADOPTING AND APPROVING MAGISTRATES REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 1/13/2022 - id number 2353935

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $395.00 AssessmentID 11857903

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHEMENT TO COMPLAINT/ EXHIBIT A- COPY OF THE CONTRACT/ EXHIBIT B - COPY OF THE PROPOSED FLOOR PLANS / EXHIBIT C - COPY OF THE NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT / EXHIBIT D- PLAINTIFFS' DEMAND LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 990923

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 1/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 1/13/2022 - id number 2330951

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11827088

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CA000123CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 1/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less