This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/18/2020 at 11:47:42 (UTC).

LANDMARK SERVICES OF SOUTHWEST FLORIDA INC VS BAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 03/09/2020 LANDMARK SERVICES OF SOUTHWEST FLORIDA INC filed an Other lawsuit against BAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********20AX

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANDMARK SERVICES OF SOUTHWEST FLORIDA INC

Defendant

BAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY JAMES MANGANIELLO III

Defendant Attorneys

SCOTT DANIEL FEATHER

JAMES LEONARD PRICE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

07/08/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE COMPLAINT

06/19/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S REPLY AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING TUESDAY, JUNE 9, 2020 9:30 A.M.

06/04/2020 - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING TUESDAY, JUNE 9, 2020 9:30 A.M.

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.,

06/03/2020 - DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.,

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING (AS TO TELEPHONIC HEARING) TUESDAY, JUNE 9, 2020 TIME: 9:30 A.M. DEFENDANT BAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICESMOTION TO DISMISS LANDMARK SERVICES OF SOUTHWEST FLORIDA'S COMPLAINT

06/03/2020 - AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING (AS TO TELEPHONIC HEARING) TUESDAY, JUNE 9, 2020 TIME: 9:30 A.M. DEFENDANT BAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICESMOTION TO DISMISS LANDMARK SERVICES OF SOUTHWEST FLORIDA'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION - JAMES L. PRICE ESQ APPEARS OBO BAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC

04/29/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION - JAMES L. PRICE ESQ APPEARS OBO BAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC

NOTICE OF HEARING - DATE: TUESDAY, JUNE 9, 2020 TIME: 9:30 A.M.

04/23/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING - DATE: TUESDAY, JUNE 9, 2020 TIME: 9:30 A.M.

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES - SCOTT FEATHER OBO BAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.

04/16/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES - SCOTT FEATHER OBO BAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.

BAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS LANDMARK'S COMPLAINT

04/16/2020 - BAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS LANDMARK'S COMPLAINT

SUMMONS SERVED BAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC. 03-27-2020

04/02/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED BAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC. 03-27-2020

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

04/02/2020 - NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

COMPLAINT

03/08/2020 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET 2

03/08/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET 2

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC 3/9/2020

03/08/2020 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC 3/9/2020

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/08/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REPLY AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Hearing06/09/2020 at 09:30AM - JACS-DISMISS; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 5-E; Judge: SNIFFEN, CHARLES; Result: CANCELLED-JACS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING TUESDAY, JUNE 9, 2020 9:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING (AS TO TELEPHONIC HEARING) TUESDAY, JUNE 9, 2020 TIME: 9:30 A.M. DEFENDANT BAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICESMOTION TO DISMISS LANDMARK SERVICES OF SOUTHWEST FLORIDA'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION - JAMES L. PRICE ESQ APPEARS OBO BAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - DATE: TUESDAY, JUNE 9, 2020 TIME: 9:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES - SCOTT FEATHER OBO BAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS LANDMARK'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED BAY AREA ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC. 03-27-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$410.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 813187; Tender Amount: $410.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT EXHIBIT A COPIES OF TERMS AND CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC 3/9/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDMARK SERVICES OF SOUTH WEST FLORIDA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANGANIELLO, ANTHONY