Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 09/28/2020 at 14:39:03 (UTC).

LAMESHA SHAQUITA BOYD Et Al VS TYREE LAROME BRIDGES SR

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 LAMESHA SHAQUITA BOYD filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against TYREE LAROME BRIDGES SR. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********68AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE

 

Party Details

Petitioners

LAMESHA SHAQUITA BOYD

THE STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Respondent

TYREE LAROME BRIDGES SR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketANSWER - TYEE BRIDGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketFORM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketFORM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM TYREE BRIDGES DATED 05/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS SERVED AS TO TYREE LAROME BRIDGES SR. ON 5/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketALIAS ESUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO TYREE LAROME BRIDGES SR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS JUDICIAL PROCEEDING TO TYREE LAROME BRIDGES SR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS NON-SERVED AS TO TYREE LAROME BRIDGES SR ON 3/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) - LAMESHA SHAQUITA BOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketESUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO TYREE LAROME BRIDGES SR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketPATERNITY DECLARATION - LAMESHA SHAQUITA BOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS JUDICIAL PROCEEDING TO TYREE LAROME BRIDGES SR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO ESTABLISH PATERNITY, SUPPORT AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant