This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 04/24/2023 at 13:30:56 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC VS DEL TIERRA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against DEL TIERRA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********80AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

JOSUE MARBACH

KIMBERLY MARBACH

TECHNOLOGY CREDIT UNION

DEL TIERRA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN IAN MEISELS

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL WILLIAM COCHRAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/23/2023 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

02/23/2023 - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

02/23/2023 - VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - COPY OF THE NOTE / EXHIBIT B - COPY OF THE MORTGAGE /

02/23/2023 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - COPY OF THE NOTE / EXHIBIT B - COPY OF THE MORTGAGE /

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT DEL TIERRA HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC./ JOSUE MARBACH/ KIMBERLY MARBACH/ TECHNOLOGY CREDIT UNION -- ISSUED 2/24/2023

02/23/2023 - SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT DEL TIERRA HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC./ JOSUE MARBACH/ KIMBERLY MARBACH/ TECHNOLOGY CREDIT UNION -- ISSUED 2/24/2023

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS-RECORDED IN OFFICALS RECORDS

02/23/2023 - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS-RECORDED IN OFFICALS RECORDS

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED DEL TIERRA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION ICN 3/3/2023

03/13/2023 - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED DEL TIERRA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION ICN 3/3/2023

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED KIMBERLY MARBACH 3/2/2023

03/13/2023 - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED KIMBERLY MARBACH 3/2/2023

CO-DEFENDANT'S, DEL TIERRA HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC., ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

03/20/2023 - CO-DEFENDANT'S, DEL TIERRA HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC., ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

03/20/2023 - NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSION

03/20/2023 - REQUEST FOR ADMISSION

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S, DEL TIERRA HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC., REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/24/2023 - PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S, DEL TIERRA HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC., REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S, DEL TIERRA HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC., REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCO-DEFENDANT'S, DEL TIERRA HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC., ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED KIMBERLY MARBACH 3/2/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED DEL TIERRA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION ICN 3/3/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $955.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1118532; Tender Amount: $955.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS-RECORDED IN OFFICALS RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT DEL TIERRA HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC./ JOSUE MARBACH/ KIMBERLY MARBACH/ TECHNOLOGY CREDIT UNION -- ISSUED 2/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - COPY OF THE NOTE / EXHIBIT B - COPY OF THE MORTGAGE /

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1118532

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 2/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 2/24/2023 - id number 2489973

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $905.00 AssessmentID 12044465

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase 412023CA000780CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 2/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less