This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/29/2020 at 20:42:30 (UTC).

KONSTANTINOS O. LABOVITES

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 KONSTANTINOS O LABOVITES was filed as a Family - Other Family lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********18AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KONSTANTINOS O. LABOVITES

Bradenton, FL 34210

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketFDLE REPORT SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketORDER ENTRY AND FINAL JUDGMENT OF CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT) -RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketMAGISTRATE'S DECISION AND RECOMMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • Hearing06/11/2020 at 10:00AM - JACS-OTHER MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: HEARING ROOM #2 - 3RD FLOOR; Judge: CASKEY, DAVID P; Result: CANCELLED-JACS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • Hearing06/11/2020 at 09:30AM - JACS-OTHER MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: HEARING ROOM #2 - 3RD FLOOR; Judge: CASKEY, DAVID P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketSECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING JUNE 11, 2020 TIME: 9:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE AND NOTICE OF HEARING JUNE 11 2020 AT 930AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO MOTION - (1) COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketPRO SE MOTION TO CONTINUE WITH NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketRULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNEEDS LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$400.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797067; Tender Amount: $400.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF BIRTH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less