This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/30/2020 at 11:12:44 (UTC).

KENNETH A PHILLIPS, KENNETH M PHILLIPS Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 KENNETH A PHILLIPS, KENNETH M PHILLIPS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENO G ECONOMOU. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********66AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENO G ECONOMOU

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

KENNETH M PHILLIPS

Beach, FL 34217

Decedent

KENNETH A PHILLIPS

Beach, FL 34217

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

GEORGE BROWNING III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR CLOSING ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO PETITION FOR DISCHARGE EXHIBITS A-B PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FEE: / DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE ASSETS: /

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER OF DISCHARGE - FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW 5/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT OF ATTORNEY FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE- KENNETH M PHILLIPS TRUSTEE KENNETH A PHILLIPS REVOCABLE TRUST AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION - 1/31/2020 - NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketINVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF KENNETH A. PHILLIPS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$400.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 796978; Tender Amount: $400.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketE-FILED COPY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF KENNETH A. PHILLIPS - IMAGE AS E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH - KENNETH ALBERT PHILLIPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT - KENNETH M. PHILLIPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less