This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/18/2020 at 13:30:41 (UTC).

KENF LLC VS MICHAEL T JOHNSON Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 KENF LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against MICHAEL T JOHNSON. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********48AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENF LLC

Defendants

MICHAEL T JOHNSON

OLIVIA L CLARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL GEORGE F DAVIS

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 3/23/2020

03/19/2020 - WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 3/23/2020

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICITION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

03/18/2020 - FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICITION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

DEFAULT BY COURT ENTERED 03/16/2020

03/18/2020 - DEFAULT BY COURT ENTERED 03/16/2020

SUMMONS SERVED MICHAEL JOHNSON AKA MICHAEL T. JOHNSON 2/26/2020

03/06/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED MICHAEL JOHNSON AKA MICHAEL T. JOHNSON 2/26/2020

SUMMONS SERVED OLIVIA CLARK AKA OLIVIA L. CLARK 2/26/2020

03/06/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED OLIVIA CLARK AKA OLIVIA L. CLARK 2/26/2020

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT POSSESSION ONLY (RESIDENTIAL EVICTION) (FOR FAILURE TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO THE COURT REGISTRY)

03/06/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT POSSESSION ONLY (RESIDENTIAL EVICTION) (FOR FAILURE TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO THE COURT REGISTRY)

PLAINTIFF'S VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

03/06/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/27/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: OLIVIA CLARK AKA OLIVIA L. CLARK 2/26/2020

02/21/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: OLIVIA CLARK AKA OLIVIA L. CLARK 2/26/2020

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO MICHAEL JOHNSON/ OLIVIA CLARK 2/20/2020

02/19/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO MICHAEL JOHNSON/ OLIVIA CLARK 2/20/2020

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

02/19/2020 - COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/19/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 3/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICITION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT BY COURT ENTERED 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED MICHAEL JOHNSON AKA MICHAEL T. JOHNSON 2/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED OLIVIA CLARK AKA OLIVIA L. CLARK 2/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT POSSESSION ONLY (RESIDENTIAL EVICTION) (FOR FAILURE TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO THE COURT REGISTRY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM DEFEDANT FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM DEFENDANT FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketPLEADING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$215.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 807517; Tender Amount: $10.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: OLIVIA CLARK AKA OLIVIA L. CLARK 2/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$215.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 806300; Tender Amount: $205.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketLEASE/ THREE DAY NOTICE TO PAY RENT OR GIVE POSSESSION ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO MICHAEL JOHNSON/ OLIVIA CLARK 2/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL GEORGE F DAVIS