This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/03/2020 at 14:01:08 (UTC).

KENF LLC VS CARLOS RINUS Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 KENF LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CARLOS RINUS. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT A FARRANCE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********00AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT A FARRANCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENF LLC

Defendants

ISRAEL ORTEGA

MARC NOEL

CARLOS RINUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL GEORGE F DAVIS

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

03/02/2020 - WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 2/19/2020

02/13/2020 - WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 2/19/2020

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION POSSESSION ONLY - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

02/10/2020 - FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION POSSESSION ONLY - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

SUMMONS POSTED MARC NOEL ON 01/24/2020

02/03/2020 - SUMMONS POSTED MARC NOEL ON 01/24/2020

SUMMONS POSTED CARLOS RINUS ON 01/24/2020

02/03/2020 - SUMMONS POSTED CARLOS RINUS ON 01/24/2020

SUMMONS POSTED ISRAEL ORTEGA ON 01/24/2020

02/03/2020 - SUMMONS POSTED ISRAEL ORTEGA ON 01/24/2020

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY THE CLERK AS TO: ISRAEL ORTEGA, CARLOS RINUS AND MARC NOEL/ DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED 2/4/2020

02/03/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY THE CLERK AS TO: ISRAEL ORTEGA, CARLOS RINUS AND MARC NOEL/ DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED 2/4/2020

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO: ISRAEL ORTEGA, CARLOS RINUS AND MARC NOEL

02/03/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO: ISRAEL ORTEGA, CARLOS RINUS AND MARC NOEL

PLAINTIFF'S VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

02/03/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/24/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/24/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/24/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ISRAEL ORTEGA/MARC NOEL/CARLOS RINUS 01/23/2020

01/21/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ISRAEL ORTEGA/MARC NOEL/CARLOS RINUS 01/23/2020

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

01/21/2020 - COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/21/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 2/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION POSSESSION ONLY - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS POSTED MARC NOEL ON 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS POSTED CARLOS RINUS ON 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS POSTED ISRAEL ORTEGA ON 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY THE CLERK AS TO: ISRAEL ORTEGA, CARLOS RINUS AND MARC NOEL/ DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED 2/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO: ISRAEL ORTEGA, CARLOS RINUS AND MARC NOEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$215.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 796574; Tender Amount: $215.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketLEASE/THREE DAY NOTICE ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ISRAEL ORTEGA/MARC NOEL/CARLOS RINUS 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less