This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/28/2020 at 12:16:27 (UTC).

KELLY GRADY VS GREGORY MCCLELLAN

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 KELLY GRADY filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GREGORY MCCLELLAN. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********14AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KELLY GRADY

Bradenton, FL 34208

Respondent

GREGORY MCCLELLAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • Hearing07/08/2020 at 08:30AM - JACS-UNLISTED MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 3-E; Judge: MORELAND, DIANA L;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • Hearing07/08/2020 at 08:30AM - INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 3-E; Judge: MORELAND, DIANA L; Result: HEARING HELD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION TO DISSOLVE INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE-DENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketINJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION CHECKLIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISSOLVE INJUNCTION RETURNED MAIL FROM PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISSOLVE INJUNCTION SET FOR HEARING JULY 8, 2020 AT 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO DISSOLVE INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION FILED BY PETITIONER (SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITH MINOR CHILD(REN) (AFTER NOTICE) SERVED - 3/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Hearing03/04/2020 at 08:30AM - JACS-UNLISTED MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 3-E; Judge: MORELAND, DIANA L;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Hearing03/04/2020 at 08:30AM - INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 3-E; Judge: MORELAND, DIANA L; Result: HEARING HELD;

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE -UNEXECUTED BY CHARLOTTE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (SENT TO SARASOTA AND CHARLOTTE COUNTY FOR SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPETITIONER'S WAIVER OR NON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketRULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT(UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketLAW ENFORCEMENT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less