Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 04/08/2021 at 13:01:26 (UTC).

KATHLEEN MARGARET MADIGAN Et Al VS LEE BARTOW BRINSON

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 KATHLEEN MARGARET MADIGAN filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against LEE BARTOW BRINSON. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TERI K DEES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********09AX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TERI K DEES

 

Party Details

Petitioners

THE STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

KATHLEEN MARGARET MADIGAN

Respondent

LEE BARTOW BRINSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketPREP SHEET FOR NEW DEPOSITORY CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDEPOSITORY PAYMENT HISTORY FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA DATED 2/17/2021 ( COPY FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA TRANSFER CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF DEPOSITORY PAYMENT HISTORY FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA DATED 2/17/2021 ( COPY FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA TRANSFER CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketORDER TO ENFORCE SUPPORT ORDER REPORT OF THE CHILD SUPPORT HEARING OFFICER; TRANSFER OF VENUE TO MANATEE COUNTY, FLORIDA SIGNED 2/4/2021 ( COPY FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA TRANSFER CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT POSTAI VERIFICATION - LEE BARTOW BRINSON ( COPY FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA TRANSFER CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDEPOSITORY PAYMENT HISTORY FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA DATED 1/05/2021 ( COPY FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA TRANSFER CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT POSTAL VERIFICATION - LEE BARTOW BRINSON ( COPY FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA TRANSFER CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING USING ZOOM CONFERENCING ( COPY FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA TRANSFER CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO ENFORCE SUPPORT ORDER ( COPY FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA TRANSFER CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO E1NFORCE SUPPORT ORDER ( COPY FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA TRANSFER CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR SUPPORT; REPORT OF THE CHILD SUPPORT HEARING OFFICER - RECORDED IN CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA OFFICIAL RECORDS ( COPY FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA TRANSFER CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 8/14/2002 ( COPY FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA TRANSFER CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO LEE BARTOW BRINSON ( COPY FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA TRANSFER CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketIDENTIFYING INFORMATION AS REQUIRED BY SECTIONS 61.13(9),61.13(10), 742.031(3), 742.032(1), AND/OR 742.10(2), FLORIDA STATUTES ( COPY FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA TRANSFER CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - KATHLEEN MADIGAN ( COPY FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA TRANSFER CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( COPY FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA TRANSFER CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUPPORT AND OTHER RELIEF ( COPY FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA TRANSFER CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA CASE# 2002 DR 2191 PROGRESS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF 2/01/2021 ORDER TO ENFORCE SUPPORT ORDER REPORT OF THE CHILD SUPPORT HEARING OFFICER FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA (THIS ORDER TRANSFERS VENUE TO MANATEE COUNTY, FLORIDA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM CITRUS COUNTY, FLORIDA CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant