This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 12/17/2022 at 17:08:10 (UTC).

K W, KATEISHA CLAYTON Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 K W, KATEISHA CLAYTON was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********85AX

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KATEISHA CLAYTON

Bradenton, FL 34208

Not Yet Classified

K W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRANDON F JONES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE TO BE CONDUCTED ON ZOOM PLATFORM - SEPTEMBER 21ST, 2022 AT 3:00PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $232.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 932633; Tender Amount: $231.00; Receipt Number: 1041766; Tender Amount: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1041766

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $1.00 AssessmentID 11911641

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF A MINOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Hearing04/28/2022 at 03:00PM - JACS-CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 5-D; Judge: MORELAND, DIANA L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - 04/28/2022 AT 3:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • Hearing04/06/2022 at 03:00PM - JACS-PETITION/GUARDIANSHIP; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 5-D; Judge: MORELAND, DIANA L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING TO BE CONDUCTED ON ZOOM PLATFORM - 04/06/2022 AT 3:00 PM - MATTER: PETITION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT OF A MINOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketREPORT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO APPROVE THE SETTLEMENT OF A MINOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Hearing07/13/2021 at 03:00PM - JACS-PETITION/GUARDIANSHIP; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 5-D; Judge: MORELAND, DIANA L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - DATE: TUESDAY, JULY 13, 2021 - TIME: 3:00 P.M. - MATTER: PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $232.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 932633; Tender Amount: $231.00; Receipt Number: 1041766; Tender Amount: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 932633

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 6/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO APPROVE MINOR SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 6/19/2021 - id number 2250001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $231.00 AssessmentID 11718712

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCase 412021GA001985GAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 6/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONES , BRANDON F