Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/21/2020 at 13:44:54 (UTC).

JUNIOR MAXIMILIANO LOPEZ DIONICIO VS KARLA JATZIBIRI BAHENA MORALES

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 JUNIOR MAXIMILIANO LOPEZ DIONICIO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KARLA JATZIBIRI BAHENA MORALES. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********89AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JUNIOR MAXIMILIANO LOPEZ DIONICIO

Bradenton, FL 34205

Respondent

KARLA JATZIBIRI BAHENA MORALES

Bradenton, FL 34208

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL HEARING JUNE 29, 2020 9:30 A.M. VIA ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL HEARING JUNE 29, 2020 9:00 A.M. VIA ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED 5/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVER LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM CASE MANAGER- HEARING 6/29/20 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT TO BE ENTERED BY CLERK - CLERK CAN NOT ISSUE, DEFAULT NOT SIGNED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) OR PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketDISCLOSURE FROM NONLAWYER- JUNIOR MAXIMILIANO LOPEZ DIONICIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF AS TO; KARLA JATZIBIRI BAHENA MORALES SUMMONS: PERSONAL SERVICE ON AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNONMILITARY AFFIDAVIT- JUNIOR MAXIMILIANO LOPEZ DIONICIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED- JUNIOR MAXIMILIANO LOPEZ DIONICIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE- JUNIOR MAXIMILIANO LOPEZ DIONICIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF RESIDENCY/ COPY OF ID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less