This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 04/30/2020 at 13:33:39 (UTC).

JULIE M STRAYER VS PATRICIA S TOMPKINS Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 JULIE M STRAYER filed an Other lawsuit against PATRICIA S TOMPKINS. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********84AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JULIE M STRAYER

Defendants

WILLIAM B TOMPKINS

PATRICIA S TOMPKINS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETER JOHN MACKEY

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAM CLINTON PRICE IV

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCE EVIDENTIARY HEARING

04/27/2020 - MOTION FOR ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCE EVIDENTIARY HEARING

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - MAY 08, 2020 @ 9:00 A.M

04/21/2020 - AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - MAY 08, 2020 @ 9:00 A.M

OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF HEARING

04/21/2020 - OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING- TUESDAY, APRIL 28, 2020 @ 1:30 P.M.

04/20/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING- TUESDAY, APRIL 28, 2020 @ 1:30 P.M.

ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE - DEFENDANT HAS UNTIL 5/4/2020 TO FILE ANSWER

04/17/2020 - ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE - DEFENDANT HAS UNTIL 5/4/2020 TO FILE ANSWER

MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

04/15/2020 - MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 4/14/2020 10:30 AM

04/08/2020 - AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 4/14/2020 10:30 AM

NOTICE OF HEARING TUESDAY, APRIL 14, 2020 AT 10:30 A.M. COURTROOM 5E

02/27/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING TUESDAY, APRIL 14, 2020 AT 10:30 A.M. COURTROOM 5E

MOTION TO DISMISS, MOTION TO STRIKE, AND MOTION FOR EXTENTION OF TIME - WILLIAM B. TOMPKINS AND PATRICIA S. TOMPKINS

02/13/2020 - MOTION TO DISMISS, MOTION TO STRIKE, AND MOTION FOR EXTENTION OF TIME - WILLIAM B. TOMPKINS AND PATRICIA S. TOMPKINS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES - WILLIAM C PRICE IV OBO WILLIAM B. TOMPKINS AND PATRICIA S. TOMPKINS

02/13/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES - WILLIAM C PRICE IV OBO WILLIAM B. TOMPKINS AND PATRICIA S. TOMPKINS

SUMMONS SERVED WILLIAM TOMPKINS - 02/04/2020

02/07/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED WILLIAM TOMPKINS - 02/04/2020

RETURN OF SERVICE - WILLIAM B. TOMPKINS - SUMMONS (SERVED) FEBRUARY 4, 2020

02/07/2020 - RETURN OF SERVICE - WILLIAM B. TOMPKINS - SUMMONS (SERVED) FEBRUARY 4, 2020

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: PATRICIA S. TOMPKINS / WILLIAM B. TOMPKINS

01/30/2020 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: PATRICIA S. TOMPKINS / WILLIAM B. TOMPKINS

COMPLAINT

01/30/2020 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/30/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2020
  • Hearing05/08/2020 at 09:00AM - JACS-TEMPORARY INJUNCTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 5-E; Judge: SNIFFEN, CHARLES;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION FOR ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCE EVIDENTIARY HEARING - EXHIBIT A - MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION / EXHIBIT B - AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCE EVIDENTIARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - MAY 08, 2020 @ 9:00 A.M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING- TUESDAY, APRIL 28, 2020 @ 1:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE - DEFENDANT HAS UNTIL 5/4/2020 TO FILE ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION FOR INJUNCTION - COPY OF ARIEL PHOTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Hearing04/14/2020 at 10:30AM - JACS-UNLISTED MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 5-E; Judge: SNIFFEN, CHARLES;

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING TUESDAY, APRIL 14, 2020 AT 10:30 A.M. COURTROOM 5E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS, MOTION TO STRIKE, AND MOTION FOR EXTENTION OF TIME - WILLIAM B. TOMPKINS AND PATRICIA S. TOMPKINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES - WILLIAM C PRICE IV OBO WILLIAM B. TOMPKINS AND PATRICIA S. TOMPKINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED WILLIAM TOMPKINS - 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - WILLIAM B. TOMPKINS - SUMMONS (SERVED) FEBRUARY 4, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$420.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 800008; Tender Amount: $420.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: PATRICIA S. TOMPKINS / WILLIAM B. TOMPKINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESINATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less