This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 11/06/2022 at 10:00:25 (UTC).

JUDY WHIGHAM, JUDY WHIGHAM Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 JUDY WHIGHAM, JUDY WHIGHAM was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********61AX

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Decedent

RUDOLPH ELVIN WHIGHAM

Palmetto, FL 34221

Not Yet Classified and Trustees

JUDY WHIGHAM

Gibsonton, FL 33534

WHIGHAM FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

ROBERT D HINES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketCHECKLIST PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND CLOSING ESTATE - REVIEWED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type CP 12 MONTHS - DISCH was satisfied with Compliance Action - COMPLETED set on 2/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER OF DISCHARGE - SENT TO PROBATE COORDINATOR 2/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCHECKLIST: PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND CLOSING ESTATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE, SERVICE OF PETITION POR DISCHARGE AND RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE - JUDY WHIGHAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS - JUDY WHIGHAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type CP OTCD was satisfied with Compliance Action - COMPLETED set on 1/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH - RUDOLPH ELVIN WHIGHAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT - JUDY WHIGHAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 6/19/2021 - id number 2249056

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $41.00 AssessmentID 11717242

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11717241

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCase 412021CP001961CPAXMA Filed with Clerk on 6/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES, ROBERT D.