This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 03/03/2021 at 13:40:48 (UTC).

JUAN SEBASTIAN PARROTT VS CLAYTON WADE PARROTT

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 JUAN SEBASTIAN PARROTT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CLAYTON WADE PARROTT. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN BRUNING. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********78AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEVIN BRUNING

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JUAN SEBASTIAN PARROTT

Respondent

CLAYTON WADE PARROTT

Muskegon, MI 49442

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED TO CLAYTON PARROTT ON 2-3-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNEEDS LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF SUMMONS: PERSONAL SERVICE ON AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) OR PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDISCLOSURE FROM NONLAWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER FOR MANATEE, SARASOTA AND DESOTO COUNTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURRTY NUMBER-JUAN PARROT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketBUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS INFORMATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF PASSPORT- JUAN PARROT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE- JUAN PARROT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketTWELFTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT FAMILY DIVISION RULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE- JUAN PARROT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT/TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less