This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 03/17/2022 at 07:01:44 (UTC).

JOYCE H BOOKER, PAUL G BOOKER Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 JOYCE H BOOKER, PAUL G BOOKER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********48AX

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOYCE H BOOKER

Bradenton, FL 34203

Decedent

PAUL G BOOKER

Bradenton, FL 34203

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DANA LAGANELLA GERLING

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT - MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT PAUL G BOOKER RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$345.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 933910; Tender Amount: $345.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE OF FILING PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF PAUL G BOOKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 933910

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 6/29/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE - PAUL G BOOKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE - SENT TO JA 7/1/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 6/29/2021 - id number 2251694

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00 AssessmentID 11721101

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCase 412021CP002048CPAXMA Filed with Clerk on 6/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GERLING, DANA