This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/29/2020 at 19:36:29 (UTC).

JOYCE D WILLIAMS, VICTORIA WALES Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 JOYCE D WILLIAMS, VICTORIA WALES was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENO G ECONOMOU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********65AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENO G ECONOMOU

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

VICTORIA WALES

Lutz, FL 33549

Decedent

JOYCE D WILLIAMS

Palmetto, FL 34221

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

ROBERT SCOTT WALTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketINVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketORDER TO CORRECT DEFICIENCIES - INV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION - VICTORIA WALES,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION - VICTORIA WALES, TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION - 2/14/2020 - NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF JOYCE D. WILLIAMS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION REVIEWED - NO ADDITIONAL ACTION REQUIRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$400.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 796964; Tender Amount: $400.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF JOYCE D. WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketE-FILED COPY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF JOYCE D. WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT - VICTORIA WALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH - JOYCE WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM ROBERT S. WALTON, ESQ. - DATED JANUARY 22, 2020 - FILING DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less