Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 14:49:16 (UTC).

JOSEPHINE OGRADY VS THOMAS E OGRADY

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 JOSEPHINE OGRADY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against THOMAS E OGRADY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********22AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOSEPHINE OGRADY

Respondent

THOMAS E OGRADY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LISA JOY KLEINBERG

Respondent Attorney

CARMEN R GILLETT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketANSWER TO AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO AMEND PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF EMAIL DATED 05/22/2020 REGARDING STIPULATION TO AMEND PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ATTACHED TO MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO AMEND PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS ON HUSBAND AND TO DISMISS PETITION FOR DISSOLUTINO OF MARRIAGE FOR IMPROPER SERVICE AND LACK OF JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SPECIAL LIMITED APPEARANCE - CARMEN R. GILLETT, PLLC ON BEHALF THOMAS E. O'GRADY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE AS TO THOMAS E OGRADY SERVED 02/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION REVIEWED - NO ADDITIONAL ACTION REQUIRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$407.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 798814; Tender Amount: $407.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED AS TO THOMAS E. O'GRADY - 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LISA JOY KLEINBERG