This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/16/2020 at 12:02:18 (UTC).

JORALIZ LARUMBE RUSSO VS MARK RUSSO

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 JORALIZ LARUMBE RUSSO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARK RUSSO. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DIANA L MORELAND and STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********33AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DIANA L MORELAND

STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JORALIZ LARUMBE RUSSO

Respondent

MARK RUSSO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAVID A FERNANDEZ

Respondent Attorney

DONNA JOY BUCHHOLZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 12.285 MANDATORY DISCLOSURE- MARK RUSSO,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PARENTING CLASS CERTIFICATE - JORALIZ LARUMBE RUSSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY -APRIL 9, 2020 - APRIL 19, 2020. DONNA J. BUCHHOLZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - MARK RUSSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS -DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$397.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797248; Tender Amount: $397.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF RESIDENCY JORALIZ RUSSO - TRANSFERED CASE FROM HILLSBOBROUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET- TRANSFERED CASE FROM HILLSBOBROUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- JORALIZ LARUMBE RUSSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MANATEE COUNTY, FLORIDA- TRANSFERED CASE FROM HILLSBOBROUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING- TRANSFERED CASE FROM HILLSBOBROUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDISCLOSURE FROM NONLAWYER- TRANSFERED CASE FROM HILLSBOBROUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketHILLSBOROUGH COUNTY INFORMATION SHEET- TRANSFERED CASE FROM HILLSBOBROUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESSES- TRANSFERED CASE FROM HILLSBOBROUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCF WRRH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE- JORALIZ LARUMBE RUSSO - TRANSFERED CASE FROM HILLSBOBROUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketCASE SUMMARY (TRANSFERRED FROM HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketDETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS WORKSHEET - GRANTED (TRANSFERRED FROM HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MANATEE COUNTY, FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less