This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 01/26/2022 at 13:32:42 (UTC).

JON VRABEC VS UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 JON VRABEC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********17AX

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JON VRABEC

Defendant

UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLY-ANN MCLAUGHLIN JENKINS

Defendant Attorney

KATELYN MAE FERRY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/24/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/24/2021 - COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

11/24/2021 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY -- ISSUED 11/29/2021

11/24/2021 - SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY -- ISSUED 11/29/2021

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FRIDAY, DECEMBER 3, 2021

12/03/2021 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FRIDAY, DECEMBER 3, 2021

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES KATELYN FERRY, ESQUIRE AND MATTHEW K. BARCLAY, ESQ. OBO UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTYINSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

12/13/2021 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES KATELYN FERRY, ESQUIRE AND MATTHEW K. BARCLAY, ESQ. OBO UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTYINSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

12/17/2021 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FROM DISCOVERY

01/10/2022 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FROM DISCOVERY

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FROM DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS - EXHIBITS A - E -COPIES OF ORDERS ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FROM MULTIPLE FLORIDA COUNTYS / COPY OF LEGISLATURE 2021 / COPY OF ARTICLE INSURANCE JOURNAL / INSURANCE REFORM - RON DESANTIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES KATELYN FERRY, ESQUIRE AND MATTHEW K. BARCLAY, ESQ. OBO UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTYINSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FRIDAY, DECEMBER 3, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$410.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 976834; Tender Amount: $410.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY -- ISSUED 11/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFEF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFE'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF CURRENT E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 976834

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 11/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 11/25/2021 - id number 2310559

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11800730

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase 412021CA004817CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 11/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLY-ANN JENKINS