This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/09/2020 at 14:05:22 (UTC).

JOHN R LAVELY VS MELISSA BARR

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 JOHN R LAVELY filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against MELISSA BARR. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********71AX

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN R LAVELY

Defendant

MELISSA BARR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN PAUL FLECK JR

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

01/07/2020 - WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

12/31/2019 - FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

DEFAULT FOR FAILURE TO POST RENT BY COURT 12/30/19

12/31/2019 - DEFAULT FOR FAILURE TO POST RENT BY COURT 12/30/19

LETTER FROM DEFENDANT FORWARDED TO JUDGE

12/19/2019 - LETTER FROM DEFENDANT FORWARDED TO JUDGE

NOTICE OF HEARING DECEMBER 30, 2019 AT 10:30 A.M.

12/23/2019 - NOTICE OF HEARING DECEMBER 30, 2019 AT 10:30 A.M.

MOTION FOR A DEFAULT JUDGMENT - FAILURE TO POST RENT FOR NOVEMBER AND DECEMBER

12/19/2019 - MOTION FOR A DEFAULT JUDGMENT - FAILURE TO POST RENT FOR NOVEMBER AND DECEMBER

MOTION FOR DEFAULT- FAILURE TO POST RENT

12/19/2019 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT- FAILURE TO POST RENT

SUMMONS POSTED MELISSA BARR ON 12/14/19

12/17/2019 - SUMMONS POSTED MELISSA BARR ON 12/14/19

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/16/2019 - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: MELISSA BARR 12/13/2019

12/13/2019 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: MELISSA BARR 12/13/2019

ACTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY

12/13/2019 - ACTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF ALIAS WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED 12/31/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED 12/31/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FOR FAILURE TO POST RENT BY COURT 12/30/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketALIAS WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 12/31/2019/ HANDED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED- PICKED UP BY PLANTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Hearing12/30/2019 at 10:40AM - JACS-FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Hearing12/30/2019 at 10:35AM - JACS-DEFAULT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING DECEMBER 30, 2019 AT 10:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR A DEFAULT JUDGMENT - FAILURE TO POST RENT FOR NOVEMBER AND DECEMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT- FAILURE TO POST RENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER FROM DEFENDANT FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPLEADING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS POSTED MELISSA BARR ON 12/14/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$195.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 785918; Tender Amount: $195.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: MELISSA BARR 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE/ THREE DAY NOTICE TO TENANT AND DEMAND FOR PAYMENT OR POSSESSION ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less