This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/14/2020 at 04:20:20 (UTC).

JOHN & LUCINDA HATHAWAY TRUST, JOHN R HATHAWAY III Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 JOHN LUCINDA HATHAWAY TRUST, JOHN R HATHAWAY III was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENO G ECONOMOU. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********09AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENO G ECONOMOU

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Trustee

JOHN R HATHAWAY III

Key, FL 34228

Decedent

LUCINDA C HATHAWAY

Key, FL 34228

Not Yet Classified

JOHN & LUCINDA HATHAWAY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FREDRIC CHARLES JACOBS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF LUCINDA C. HATHAWAY - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION REVIEWED - NO ADDITIONAL ACTION REQUIRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$386.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 798120; Tender Amount: $386.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF LUCINDA C. HATHAWAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH - LUCINDA CHURCHMAN HATHAWAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT - JOHN R. HATHAWAY III, TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED - ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE - SENT TO PROBATE COORDINATOR IN AM RUN ON1/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less