This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/11/2020 at 16:44:48 (UTC).

JOANNE MIZE Et Al VS KEVIN MATTHEW TURNER Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 JOANNE MIZE filed an Other lawsuit against KEVIN MATTHEW TURNER. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********53AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOANNE MIZE

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

MARK ANDREW TURNER

KEVIN MATTHEW TURNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CATHARINE DENISE HANLEY

Defendant Attorney

VIRGIL WILLIAM WRIGHT III

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

06/01/2020 - VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

ORDER CANCELLING HEARING FRIDAY, MARCH 27, 2020 AT 10:50AM,

03/23/2020 - ORDER CANCELLING HEARING FRIDAY, MARCH 27, 2020 AT 10:50AM,

ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO APPEAR BY PHONE FRIDAY, MARCH 27, 2020 AT 10:50AM

03/19/2020 - ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO APPEAR BY PHONE FRIDAY, MARCH 27, 2020 AT 10:50AM

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR MEDIATION HEARING

03/18/2020 - DEFENDANTS MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR MEDIATION HEARING

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

03/18/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION SET FOR MARCH 27, 2020, AT 10:50 AM IN COURTROOM 4C

03/18/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION SET FOR MARCH 27, 2020, AT 10:50 AM IN COURTROOM 4C

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORIES

03/09/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, KEVIN MATTHEW TURNER

03/09/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, KEVIN MATTHEW TURNER

MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

03/03/2020 - MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/02/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/18/2020 - ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL BY VIRGIL W. WRIGHT, III, ESQ OBO DEFENDANTS, KEVIN MATTHEW TURNER AND MARK ANDREW TURNER

02/18/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL BY VIRGIL W. WRIGHT, III, ESQ OBO DEFENDANTS, KEVIN MATTHEW TURNER AND MARK ANDREW TURNER

SUMMONS SERVED KEVIN MATTHEW TURNER ON 01/29/2020

01/29/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED KEVIN MATTHEW TURNER ON 01/29/2020

SUMMONS SERVED MARK ANDREW TURNER ON 01/29/2020

01/29/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED MARK ANDREW TURNER ON 01/29/2020

CIVIL ATTACHMENT EXHIBIT A STATE FARM CAR POLICY BOOKLET /

01/22/2020 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT EXHIBIT A STATE FARM CAR POLICY BOOKLET /

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK BE ISSUED: KEVIN MATTHEW TURNER / MARK ANDREW TURNER 01/23/2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK BE ISSUED: KEVIN MATTHEW TURNER / MARK ANDREW TURNER 01/23/2020

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT KEVIN NIATTHEW'S RESPONSE TO AMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Hearing03/27/2020 at 10:50AM - JACS-UNLISTED MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CANCELLING HEARING FRIDAY, MARCH 27, 2020 AT 10:50AM,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO APPEAR BY PHONE FRIDAY, MARCH 27, 2020 AT 10:50AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR MEDIATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION SET FOR MARCH 27, 2020, AT 10:50 AM IN COURTROOM 4C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketAMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT KEVIN MATTHEW TURNER

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL BY VIRGIL W. WRIGHT, III, ESQ OBO DEFENDANTS, KEVIN MATTHEW TURNER AND MARK ANDREW TURNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED KEVIN MATTHEW TURNER ON 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED MARK ANDREW TURNER ON 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$420.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797313; Tender Amount: $420.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT EXHIBIT A STATE FARM CAR POLICY BOOKLET /

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK BE ISSUED: KEVIN MATTHEW TURNER / MARK ANDREW TURNER 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less