This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/28/2022 at 13:44:03 (UTC).

JMB MANAGEMENT TRUST LLC VS INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT

Case Summary

On 03/03/2022 JMB MANAGEMENT TRUST LLC filed an Other lawsuit against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********48AX

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JMB MANAGEMENT TRUST LLC

Defendant

INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEREK WILLIAM EISEMANN

Defendant Attorney

JOHN FORNEY RUDY III

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/03/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

VERIFIED COMPLAINT

03/03/2022 - VERIFIED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE , UNITED STATES DEPARMENT OF THE TREASURY -- ISSUED 3/7/2022

03/03/2022 - SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE , UNITED STATES DEPARMENT OF THE TREASURY -- ISSUED 3/7/2022

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

03/03/2022 - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

SUMMONS SERVED ON INTERNAL BY HERE COMES THE JUDGE ON THE 7TH DAY OF MARCH, 2022 AT 3:24 PM TO BE SERVED ON INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE MARCH, 8 2022

03/09/2022 - SUMMONS SERVED ON INTERNAL BY HERE COMES THE JUDGE ON THE 7TH DAY OF MARCH, 2022 AT 3:24 PM TO BE SERVED ON INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE MARCH, 8 2022

UNITED STATES MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR RE-FORECLOSURE

03/28/2022 - UNITED STATES MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR RE-FORECLOSURE

CIRCUIT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING 7/27/2022 AT 10:00 AM VIA ZOOM

06/09/2022 - CIRCUIT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING 7/27/2022 AT 10:00 AM VIA ZOOM

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • Hearing07/27/2022 at 10:00AM - JACS-OTHER MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SNIFFEN, CHARLES;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIRCUIT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING 7/27/2022 AT 10:00 AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNITED STATES MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR RE-FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ON INTERNAL BY HERE COMES THE JUDGE ON THE 7TH DAY OF MARCH, 2022 AT 3:24 PM TO BE SERVED ON INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE MARCH, 8 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$415.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 1008434; Tender Amount: $415.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1008434

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 3/4/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 3/4/2022 - id number 2353020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11856649

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE , UNITED STATES DEPARMENT OF THE TREASURY -- ISSUED 3/7/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - PLAINTIFF SEEKS TO RE-FORECLOSE THE PROPERTY IN ORDER TO EXTINGUISH THE IRS FEDERAL TAXLIENS/ EXHIBIT B- COPY OF THE JUDGEMENT / EXHIBIT C- COPY OF THE FORECLOSURE SALE BID LOG AND CERTIFICATION OF SALE / EXHIBIT D - CERTIFICATION OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 3/4/2022 - id number 2352989

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11856598

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CA000848CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 3/3/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Internal Revenue Service is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EISEMANN, DEREK WILLIAM