Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/29/2020 at 19:08:22 (UTC).

JILLIAN PRICE VS JOSEPH PRICE

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 JILLIAN PRICE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JOSEPH PRICE. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********46AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JILLIAN PRICE

Respondent

JOSEPH PRICE

Beach, FL 33706

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MARK THOMAS FLAHERTY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRIVATE MEDIATION THURSDAY, SEPTEMBER 10, 2020 AT 9:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF LETTER FROM ALICE SIEMER TO GAIL DATED 06-22-2020 IN REAGRDS TO PLEASE FIND ATTACHED A STIPULATION ON WIFE'S PURCHASE OF NON-MARITAL ASSET WHICH HAS BEEN E-FILED, ALONG WITH A PROPOSED ORDER ON SAME FOR JUDGE MORELAND'S CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION ON WIFE'S PURCHASE OF NON-MARITAIL ASSEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketORDER ON STIPULATION ON WIFE'S PURCHASE OF NON-MARITAL ASSET ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, THE STIPULATION ON WIFE'S PURCHASE OF NON-MARITAL ASSET IS HEREBY APPROVED, AND THE PARTIES ARE ORDERED TO COMPLY WITH THE TERMS AND CONDITIONS SET FORTH THEREIN. 2. THIS COURT SHALL RESERVE JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE THE TERMS AND CONDITIONS OF THIS STIPULATION AND ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION ON WIFE'S PURCHASE OF NON-MARITAL ASSET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GIADELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE AS TO JOSEPH PRICE SUMMONS SERVED 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$407.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 799346; Tender Amount: $407.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER FOR MANATEE, SARASOTA AND DESOTO COUNTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT - JILLIAN PRICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JOSEPH PRICE ON 1-29-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCLOSURE - JILLIAN PRICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLAHERTY, MARK