This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 04/14/2021 at 13:27:40 (UTC).

JESSICA ORTIZ VS CRAIG ANTHONY SCHERER Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 JESSICA ORTIZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CRAIG ANTHONY SCHERER. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********47AX

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JESSICA ORTIZ

Defendants

CRAIG ANTHONY SCHERER

DAVID KEITH SCHERER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARL EDWARD REYNOLDS III

Defendant Attorneys

MARK STEVEN RAMEY

TERRY SCHUYLER FORD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE TERRY S. FORD, ESQUIRE OBO DAVID KEITH SCHERER.

02/18/2021 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE TERRY S. FORD, ESQUIRE OBO DAVID KEITH SCHERER.

FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY MARK S. RAMEY, ESQUIIRE

02/16/2021 - FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY MARK S. RAMEY, ESQUIIRE

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/12/2021 - PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DEFENDANT, CRAIG ANTHONY SCHERER'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

01/26/2021 - DEFENDANT, CRAIG ANTHONY SCHERER'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

SUMMONS SERVED DAVID KEITH SCHERER 1/13/2021

01/22/2021 - SUMMONS SERVED DAVID KEITH SCHERER 1/13/2021

DEFENDANT, DAVID KEITH SCHERER'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF "MMSEA" INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

01/14/2021 - DEFENDANT, DAVID KEITH SCHERER'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF "MMSEA" INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

ESUMMONS ISSUED: CRAIG ANTHONY SCHERER / DAVID KEITH SCHERER - 12/22/2020

12/17/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED: CRAIG ANTHONY SCHERER / DAVID KEITH SCHERER - 12/22/2020

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, DAVID KEITH SCHERER

12/17/2020 - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, DAVID KEITH SCHERER

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, CRAIG ANTHONY SCHERER

12/17/2020 - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, CRAIG ANTHONY SCHERER

AMENDED* NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (*AMENDED TO REFLECT BOTH DEFENDANTS.) MARK S. RAMEY, ESQUIRE AND AMBER L. INMAN, OBO DAVID KEITH SCHERER AND CRAIG ANTHONY SCHERER,

01/26/2021 - AMENDED* NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (*AMENDED TO REFLECT BOTH DEFENDANTS.) MARK S. RAMEY, ESQUIRE AND AMBER L. INMAN, OBO DAVID KEITH SCHERER AND CRAIG ANTHONY SCHERER,

SUMMONS SERVED CRAIG ANTHONY SCHERER, JANUARY, 13 2021

01/19/2021 - SUMMONS SERVED CRAIG ANTHONY SCHERER, JANUARY, 13 2021

DEFENDANT, DAVID KEITH SCHERER'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

01/14/2021 - DEFENDANT, DAVID KEITH SCHERER'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MARK S. RAMEY, ESQUIRE AND AMBER L. INMAN, ESQUIRE, OBO DAVID KEITH SCHERER,

01/14/2021 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MARK S. RAMEY, ESQUIRE AND AMBER L. INMAN, ESQUIRE, OBO DAVID KEITH SCHERER,

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/17/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, DAVID KEITH SCHERER

12/17/2020 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, DAVID KEITH SCHERER

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, CRAIG ANTHONY SCHERER

12/17/2020 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, CRAIG ANTHONY SCHERER

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, DAVID KEITH SCHERER

12/17/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, DAVID KEITH SCHERER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/17/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS' VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES AND BETTER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS WITH EXHIBITS A - F -- RETURN OF SERVICE / NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, DAVID KEITH SCHERER / NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, CRAIG ANTHONY SCHERER / REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANTS / REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, DAVID KEITH SCHERER / LETTER FROM CARL REYNOLDS LAW DATED MARCH 16, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT(S) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT(S) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S INITIAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S "MMSEA" REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S "MMSEA" INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED: CRAIG ANTHONY SCHERER / DAVID KEITH SCHERER - 12/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, DAVID KEITH SCHERER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, CRAIG ANTHONY SCHERER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, DAVID KEITH SCHERER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, CRAIG ANTHONY SCHERER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, DAVID KEITH SCHERER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, CRAIG ANTHONY SCHERER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARL EDWARD REYNOLDS III