Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/20/2020 at 04:01:02 (UTC).

JESSE L GREENE Et Al VS FLORIDA AFFORDABLE AIR LLC

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 JESSE L GREENE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FLORIDA AFFORDABLE AIR LLC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********29AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JESSE L GREENE

SANDY L GREENE

Defendant

FLORIDA AFFORDABLE AIR LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORDAN TYLER ISRINGHAUS

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

07/15/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR AUGUST 10, 2020, AT 10:50 A.M. REGARDING PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION TO LEAVE TO AMEND AND MOTION TO TRANSFER

07/15/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR AUGUST 10, 2020, AT 10:50 A.M. REGARDING PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION TO LEAVE TO AMEND AND MOTION TO TRANSFER

MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO COUNTY COURT

06/05/2020 - MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO COUNTY COURT

PLAINTIFFSAMENDED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

06/05/2020 - PLAINTIFFSAMENDED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

ORDER CANCELLING HEARING FRIDAY, MARCH 27, 2020 AT 10:35AM

03/19/2020 - ORDER CANCELLING HEARING FRIDAY, MARCH 27, 2020 AT 10:35AM

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

03/16/2020 - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE TO PERMIT DISCOVERY

03/10/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE TO PERMIT DISCOVERY

MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL SET FOR APRIL 30, 2020

03/10/2020 - MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL SET FOR APRIL 30, 2020

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/10/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

03/10/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO INVOKE DISCOVERY RULES, MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND, AND MOTION TO CONTINUE APRIL 30 TRIAL SET FOR MARCH 27, 2020 AT 10:35 A.M. IN COURTROOM 4-C

03/10/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO INVOKE DISCOVERY RULES, MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND, AND MOTION TO CONTINUE APRIL 30 TRIAL SET FOR MARCH 27, 2020 AT 10:35 A.M. IN COURTROOM 4-C

PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER AND NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED IN OPEN COURT

03/09/2020 - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER AND NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED IN OPEN COURT

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO FLORIDA AFFORDABLE AIR, LLC, 01/23/2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO FLORIDA AFFORDABLE AIR, LLC, 01/23/2020

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • Hearing08/10/2020 at 10:50AM - JACS-AMEND; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR AUGUST 10, 2020, AT 10:50 A.M. REGARDING PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION TO LEAVE TO AMEND AND MOTION TO TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFSAMENDED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Hearing03/27/2020 at 10:35AM - JACS-MULTIPLE MOTIONS; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CANCELLING HEARING FRIDAY, MARCH 27, 2020 AT 10:35AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2020
  • Hearing03/09/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF PRESENT, REPRESENTED BY SARA JONES, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT PRESENT, PRO SE SERVED DENY CLAIM SENT TO MEDIATION TRIAL SET FOR 04/30/2020 AT 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER AND NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$317.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797641; Tender Amount: $7.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$317.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797074; Tender Amount: $310.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO FLORIDA AFFORDABLE AIR, LLC, 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JORDAN T ISRINGHAUS, ESQ